Legislature | 05/14/2025 | Presented to Governor on May 14, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 05/14/2025 | President/Speaker signed | ||
Legislature | 05/14/2025 | Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 | ||
Legislature | 05/14/2025 | Dispensing of reading at large approved | ||
Legislature | 04/29/2025 | Placed on Final Reading | ||
Legislature | 04/24/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | ||
Legislature | 04/22/2025 | Placed on Select File | ||
Legislature | 04/09/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | ||
Legislature | 03/17/2025 | Speaker priority bill | ||
Legislature | 03/11/2025 | Placed on General File | ||
Legislature | 02/06/2025 | Notice of hearing for March 06, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 01/23/2025 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | ||
Legislature | 01/21/2025 | Date of introduction |