Nebraska 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB453 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 03/05/2025

                    PREPARED BY: Kenneth Boggs 
LB 453 DATE PREPARED: March 03, 2025 
PHONE: 	471-0050  
    
Revision: 00  
  FISCAL NOTE 
 	LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE 
 
ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES 	(See narrative for political subdivision estimates) 
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS     
CASH FUNDS     
FEDERAL FUNDS     
OTHER FUNDS     
TOTAL FUNDS     
 
Any Fiscal Notes received from state agencies and political subdivisions are attached f	ollowing the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. 
 
LB 453 updates and harmonizes Nebraska’s statutes governing the appointment and oversight of guardians and conservators. The bill 
amends the background screening process for individual	s nominated as guardians or conservators. It authorizes the Nebraska State 
Patrol to collect and submit fingerprints from these applicants to the FBI for a national criminal history record check, and to prepare a 
report containing the criminal history details for the State Court Administrator. 
 
The Nebraska State Patrol states no fiscal impact form LB 453. 
 
The Supreme Court has stated that LB 453 will have a minimal fiscal impact and will not require any additional resources.  
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE   
LB: 453                AM:                            	AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Supreme Court 
   
REVIEWED BY:     	Jacob Leaver                           DATE:  3/3/2025                               PHONE: (402) 471-4173 
   
COMMENTS: Concur with the Supreme Court’s estimate of minimal fiscal impact as a result of LB 453.    
  
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE   
LB: 453               AM:                            AGENCY/POLT. SUB: State Patrol 
   
REVIEWED BY:     	Jacob Leaver                           DATE:    2/4/2025                               	PHONE: (402) 471-4173 
   
COMMENTS: Concur with the State Patrol’s estimate of no fiscal impact as a result of LB 453.    
  
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 453 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Nebraska State Patrol 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Carol Aversman Date Prepared: 
(4)
 01/29/2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402-471-4545 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION                                  
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
 
Explanation of Estimate: 
 
Immaterial / NO FISCAL IMPACT 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....    
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 453 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
05 Supreme Court 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Eric Asboe 	Date Prepared: 
(4)
 2/27/2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402-326-9215 
 
                                          ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
 Explanation of Estimate: 
 
Minimal fiscal impact to provide judicial education. No additional resources required.  
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....