Legislature | 05/09/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | ||
Legislature | 05/09/2025 | Judiciary AM438 adopted | ||
Legislature | 03/11/2025 | Judiciary AM438 filed | ||
Legislature | 03/11/2025 | Placed on General File with AM438 | ||
Legislature | 02/06/2025 | Notice of hearing for March 06, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 01/23/2025 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | ||
Legislature | 01/21/2025 | Date of introduction |