Legislature | 05/01/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | ||
Legislature | 04/30/2025 | Placed on Select File | ||
Legislature | 04/25/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | ||
Legislature | 04/25/2025 | Judiciary AM761 adopted | ||
Legislature | 03/31/2025 | Judiciary AM761 filed | ||
Legislature | 03/31/2025 | Placed on General File with AM761 | ||
Legislature | 02/06/2025 | Notice of hearing for February 28, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 01/23/2025 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | ||
Legislature | 01/21/2025 | Date of introduction |