Legislature
|
04/08/2025
|
Approved by Governor on April 7, 2025
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/03/2025
|
Presented to Governor on April 3, 2025
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/03/2025
|
President/Speaker signed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/03/2025
|
Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/03/2025
|
Dispensing of reading at large approved
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/10/2025
|
Placed on Final Reading
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/28/2025
|
Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/28/2025
|
Jacobson AM373 adopted
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/28/2025
|
Enrollment and Review ER13 adopted
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/27/2025
|
Jacobson AM373 to ER13 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/19/2025
|
Enrollment and Review ER13 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/19/2025
|
Placed on Select File with ER13
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/11/2025
|
Cavanaugh, M. name added
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/11/2025
|
Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/11/2025
|
Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM137 adopted
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/06/2025
|
Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM137 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/06/2025
|
Placed on General File with AM137
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/27/2025
|
Notice of hearing for February 04, 2025
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/24/2025
|
Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/22/2025
|
Date of introduction
|
|
|