Legislature | 04/08/2025 | Approved by Governor on April 7, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 04/03/2025 | Presented to Governor on April 3, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 04/03/2025 | President/Speaker signed | ||
Legislature | 04/03/2025 | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 | ||
Legislature | 04/01/2025 | Placed on Final Reading | ||
Legislature | 03/28/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | ||
Legislature | 03/28/2025 | Enrollment and Review ER27 adopted | ||
Legislature | 03/25/2025 | Enrollment and Review ER27 filed | ||
Legislature | 03/25/2025 | Placed on Select File with ER27 | ||
Legislature | 03/17/2025 | Speaker priority bill | ||
Legislature | 03/12/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | ||
Legislature | 03/12/2025 | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM27 adopted | ||
Legislature | 02/18/2025 | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM27 filed | ||
Legislature | 02/18/2025 | Placed on General File with AM27 | ||
Legislature | 01/29/2025 | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 01/24/2025 | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee | ||
Legislature | 01/22/2025 | Date of introduction |