Legislature
|
05/01/2025
|
Spivey FA163 lost
|
|
|
Legislature
|
05/01/2025
|
Bosn AM1183 withdrawn
|
|
|
Legislature
|
05/01/2025
|
Spivey FA166 to AM1218 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
05/01/2025
|
Spivey FA165 to AM1218 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
05/01/2025
|
Spivey FA164 to AM1218 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
05/01/2025
|
Spivey FA163 to AM1218 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/30/2025
|
Dungan FA153 lost
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/30/2025
|
Dungan FA154 lost
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/30/2025
|
Bosn AM1230 adopted
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/30/2025
|
Bosn AM1182 withdrawn
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/30/2025
|
Bosn MO216 prevailed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/30/2025
|
Bosn MO216 pending
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/30/2025
|
Judiciary AM1218 pending
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/29/2025
|
Bosn AM1230 to AM1149 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/29/2025
|
Bosn MO216 Withdraw AM1182 and Substitute AM1230 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/29/2025
|
Judiciary AM1238 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/29/2025
|
Judiciary AM1220 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/29/2025
|
Judiciary AM1219 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/29/2025
|
Judiciary AM1218 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/29/2025
|
Judiciary AM1149 divided
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/29/2025
|
Spivey MO215 Recommit to the Judiciary Committee filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/29/2025
|
Spivey MO214 Bracket until June 9, 2025 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/29/2025
|
Spivey MO213 Indefinitely postpone filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/29/2025
|
Dungan FA154 to AM1149 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/29/2025
|
Dungan FA153 to AM1149 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/28/2025
|
Bosn FA151 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/28/2025
|
Bosn AM1183 to AM1149 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/28/2025
|
Bosn AM1182 to AM1149 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/28/2025
|
Judiciary AM1149 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/28/2025
|
Placed on General File with AM1149
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/01/2025
|
Kauth MO125 withdrawn
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/01/2025
|
Kauth MO124 withdrawn
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/01/2025
|
Kauth MO123 withdrawn
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/25/2025
|
Kauth MO125 Recommit to the Judiciary Committee filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/25/2025
|
Kauth MO124 Bracket until June 9, 2025 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/25/2025
|
Kauth MO123 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6, Sec. 3(f) filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/14/2025
|
Judiciary priority bill
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/14/2025
|
Bosn FA38 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/27/2025
|
Sanders name added
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/06/2025
|
Notice of hearing for February 28, 2025
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/24/2025
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/22/2025
|
Date of introduction
|
|
|