LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Nebraska NE
Legislatures
2025-2026 Regular Session
Legislature
Bills
LB531
Action History
NE
Nebraska Legislature Bill LB531
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Nebraska 2025-2026 Regular Session
Nebraska Legislature Bill LB531
Action History
Legislature
03/17/2025
Urban Affairs AM397 filed
Legislature
03/17/2025
Placed on General File with AM397
Legislature
02/11/2025
Notice of hearing for February 18, 2025
Legislature
01/24/2025
Referred to Urban Affairs Committee
Legislature
01/22/2025
Date of introduction