Legislature | 03/25/2025 | Kauth MO122 Recommit to the Business and Labor Committee filed | ||
Legislature | 03/25/2025 | Kauth MO121 Bracket until June 9, 2025 filed | ||
Legislature | 03/25/2025 | Kauth MO120 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6, Sec. 3(f) filed | ||
Legislature | 03/19/2025 | Business and Labor AM692 filed | ||
Legislature | 03/19/2025 | Placed on General File with AM692 | ||
Legislature | 03/14/2025 | Business and Labor priority bill | ||
Legislature | 02/18/2025 | Notice of hearing for March 03, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 01/24/2025 | Referred to Business and Labor Committee | ||
Legislature | 01/22/2025 | Date of introduction |