Legislature | 03/14/2025 | McKinney MO84 Recommit to the Judiciary Committee filed | ||
Legislature | 03/14/2025 | McKinney MO83 Bracket until June 9, 2025 filed | ||
Legislature | 03/14/2025 | McKinney MO82 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6, Sec. 3(f) filed | ||
Legislature | 03/13/2025 | Riepe priority bill | ||
Legislature | 02/06/2025 | Notice of hearing for March 13, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 01/24/2025 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | ||
Legislature | 01/22/2025 | Date of introduction |