LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Nebraska NE
Legislatures
2025-2026 Regular Session
Legislature
Bills
LB622
Action History
NE
Nebraska Legislature Bill LB622
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Nebraska 2025-2026 Regular Session
Nebraska Legislature Bill LB622
Action History
Legislature
03/27/2025
Revenue AM723 filed
Legislature
03/27/2025
Placed on General File with AM723
Legislature
02/11/2025
Notice of hearing for February 21, 2025
Legislature
01/24/2025
Referred to Revenue Committee
Legislature
01/22/2025
Date of introduction