Nebraska 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB622 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/20/2025

                    PREPARED BY: Clinton Verner 
LB 622 DATE PREPARED: February 20, 2025 
PHONE: 	402-471-0056 
    
Revision: 00  
  FISCAL NOTE 
 	LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE 
 
ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES 	(See narrative for political subdivision estimates) 
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS     
CASH FUNDS $3,023,000 $3,023,000 $4,799,000 $4,799,000 
FEDERAL FUNDS     
OTHER FUNDS     
TOTAL FUNDS $3,023,000 $3,023,000 $4,799,000 $4,799,000 
 
Any Fiscal Notes received from state agencies and political subdivisions are attached f	ollowing the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. 
 
LB622 would make the following amendments to the 	the Affordable Housing Trust Fund 	(AHTF): 
- Creates a new program, the Statewide Housing Assistance Program (SHAP); 
- Expands the AHTF to allow for down payment assistance under SHAP; 
- Allows for individuals to receive loans from the AHTF under SHAP; 
- Expands AHTF to allow homebuyers to receive assistance; and 
- Gives priority under AHTF to allocating trust fund assistance to homebuyers in enter prise zones or opportunity zones or in 
areas declared extremely blighted . 
 
LB622 creates a new program	, SHAP, for providing down payment assistance for homebuyers. LB622 would allow the Department of 
Economic Development (DED) to promulgate rules and regulations concerning eligibi	lity for homebuyers under SHAP, defines down 
payment assistance and caps the assistance to $30,000 per homebuyer.  
 
LB622 raises the Documentary Stamp Tax from $2.25 to $2.55 and credits the difference to the AHTF. Estimates for re venue and 
administrative cost provided by the Department of Economic Development appears reasonable. Revenue related to recoupment o	f the 
loans is not included on this fiscal note as the timing and amounts are unknown and would likely occur outside of this biennium. LB622 
does not prescribe the amount allocated to SHAP, for the purposes of this f iscal note it is presumed the new revenue is dedicated to 
SHAP.  
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVIS ION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE 
LB:  468           AM:                         AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Department of Economic Development 
REVIEWED BY:  	Ryan Yang                     DATE:  2/1/2025                                        	PHONE: (402) 471- 4178 
COMMENTS: The Department of Economic Development assessment of fiscal impact from LB 468 appears reasonable. 
  
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 622 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Department of Economic Development 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Dave Dearmont Date Prepared: 
(4)
 1/27/2025 Phone: 
(5)
 (402) 471-3777 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION                                  
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
          
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
$3,292,000   $3,292,000   $4,735,000   $4,735,000 
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
          
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
          
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
$3,292,000   $3,292,000   $4,735,000   $4,735,000 
 
 
Explanation of Estimate: 
LB622 would create the Statewide Housing Assistance Program (SHAP), administered by a nonprofit organization 
under a contract from DED. The bill would amend section 58-706 to make downpayment assistance under SHAP, 
an eligible for assistance under the Affordable Housing Trust Fund (AHTF), and Section 58-707 would be amended 
to allow individuals to receive direct loans form the AHTF pursuant to the SHAP. Qualifying homebuyers would be 
eligible for a loan of up to $30,000 to assist with the down payment on the homebuyer’s primary residence. Loans 
under the program would be repaid upon transfer of title of the home and will be subject to a lien for the amount of 
assistance. Under SHAP, the first priority in allocating assistance among homebuyers is to homebuyers that have 
the lowest incomes and are located in enterprise or opportunity zones, and in areas that have been declared 
extremely blighted.   
 
LB622 would also increase the Documentary Stamp Tax from $2.25 per $1,000 of value to $2.55, with the increased 
$0.30 credited to the AHTF. The bill does not specify how much of the AHTF should be dedicated to the SHAP. It is 
estimated that the increase in the distribution to the AHTF would result in approximately $3.292 million and $4.735 
million in FY2025-26 and FY2026-27, respectively. 
 
Costs to implement the provisions of LB622 include an Economic Development Manager to oversee the program 
and the contractor’s work, and an IT Data/Database Analyst to manage the applications and data in the 
department’s grant management system. We estimate that the cost of the nonprofit contractor to administer the 
program would be $300,000 per year. Included in the operating costs are $300,000 for contracting with a nonprofit 
agency to administer the SHAP program, $1,710 for licenses for the department’s grant management software and 
$3,700 for additional office rent. 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ _ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
G49550 Econ Dev Manager 0.75  1.0 $52,920   $70,560  
A07051 IT Data/Database Analyst 0.25  0.25 18,460   18,460  
Benefits………………………………...……   24,990   31,160  
Operating…………………………...……….   427,890   459,470  
Travel………………………………………..   7,140   9,350  
Capital outlay…………………...…………..   8,600   	0  
Aid…………………………………………...   2,257,000   4,146,000  
Capital improvements……………………...        
      TOTAL……………………………… .....   $3,292,000   $4,735,000  
  LB 622 	Fiscal Note 2025 
 	State Agency Estimate  
State Agency Name: Department of Revenue  	Date Due LFO: 
Approved by: James R. Kamm 	Date Prepared: 02/18/2025 	Phone: 471-5896  
 	FY 2025-2026 FY 2026-2027 FY 2027-2028 
 	Expenditures Revenue Expenditures Revenue Expenditures Revenue 
General Funds       
Cash Funds  $2,754,000   $4,863,000   $5,009,000 
Federal Funds         
Other Funds         
Total Funds  $2,754,000   $4,863,000   $5,009,000 
    
 
 	Major Objects of Expenditure  
  	25-26 26-27 27-28 25-26 26-27 27-28 
Class Code 	Classification Title 	FTE FTE FTE Expenditures Expenditures Expenditures 
      
      
      
      
      
Benefits………………………………………………………………………………………………………….    
Operating Costs………………………………………………………………………………………………….    
Travel……………………………………………………………………………………………………………    
Capital Outlay…………………………………………………………………………………………………...    
Capital Improvements…………………………………………………………………………………………...    
Total…………………………………………………………………………………………………………….    
 
LB 622 creates the Statewide Housing Assistance Program (Program). The Program will be administered by a 
nonprofit corporation contracted by the Department of Economic Development. The purpose of the Program is 
to provide downpayment assistance loans towards the purchase of a new home. 
 
LB 622 raises the documentary stamp tax from $2.25 to $2.55 cents with the additional 0.30 cents to be deposited 
into the Affordable Housing Trust Fund to help fund the Program. 
 
It is estimated that increasing Documentary Stamp Tax under L B 622 will have the following impact: 
 
Fiscal Year Affordable Housing Trust Fund 
FY25-26 $      2,754,000 
FY26-27 $      4,863,000 
FY27-28 $      5,009,000 
FY28-29 $      5,160,000 
 It is estimated that there will be minimal Costs to the Department of Revenue to implement this bill. 
The operative date for this bill is October 1, 2025.