LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Nebraska NE
Legislatures
2025-2026 Regular Session
Legislature
Bills
LB629
Action History
NE
Nebraska Legislature Bill LB629
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Nebraska 2025-2026 Regular Session
Nebraska Legislature Bill LB629
Action History
Legislature
04/01/2025
Dungan AM859 to AM415 filed
Legislature
03/19/2025
Hardin AM415 filed
Legislature
03/17/2025
Notice of hearing for March 27, 2025
Legislature
01/24/2025
Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
Legislature
01/22/2025
Date of introduction