Legislature | 03/27/2025 | Health and Human Services AM704 filed | ||
Legislature | 03/27/2025 | Placed on General File with AM704 | ||
Legislature | 03/05/2025 | Hansen AM529 filed | ||
Legislature | 02/21/2025 | Notice of hearing for March 06, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 02/11/2025 | Hallstrom name added | ||
Legislature | 01/24/2025 | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee | ||
Legislature | 01/22/2025 | Date of introduction |