Legislature | 05/01/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | ||
Legislature | 05/01/2025 | Enrollment and Review ER63 adopted | ||
Legislature | 04/30/2025 | Enrollment and Review ER63 filed | ||
Legislature | 04/30/2025 | Placed on Select File with ER63 | ||
Legislature | 04/25/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | ||
Legislature | 04/25/2025 | General Affairs AM399 adopted | ||
Legislature | 02/27/2025 | Placed on General File with AM399 | ||
Legislature | 02/27/2025 | General Affairs AM399 filed | ||
Legislature | 01/30/2025 | Notice of hearing for February 10, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 01/24/2025 | Referred to General Affairs Committee | ||
Legislature | 01/22/2025 | Date of introduction |