Legislature | 04/14/2025 | Hunt MO177 Recommit to the Judiciary Committee filed | ||
Legislature | 04/14/2025 | Hunt MO176 Indefinitely postpone filed | ||
Legislature | 04/14/2025 | Hunt MO175 Recommit to the Judiciary Committee filed | ||
Legislature | 04/14/2025 | Hunt MO174 Bracket until June 9, 2025 filed | ||
Legislature | 04/14/2025 | Hunt MO173 Bracket until June 9, 2025 filed | ||
Legislature | 04/14/2025 | Hunt MO172 Recommit to the Judiciary Committee filed | ||
Legislature | 04/14/2025 | Hunt MO171 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6, Sec. 3(f) filed | ||
Legislature | 04/14/2025 | Placed on General File | ||
Legislature | 02/06/2025 | Notice of hearing for March 06, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 01/24/2025 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | ||
Legislature | 01/23/2025 | Rountree name withdrawn | ||
Legislature | 01/22/2025 | Date of introduction |