LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Nebraska NE
Legislatures
2025-2026 Regular Session
Legislature
Bills
LB698
Action History
NE
Nebraska Legislature Bill LB698
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Nebraska 2025-2026 Regular Session
Nebraska Legislature Bill LB698
Action History
Legislature
02/27/2025
McKinney MO51 Recommit to the Business and Labor Committee filed
Legislature
02/27/2025
McKinney MO50 Bracket until June 9, 2025 filed
Legislature
02/27/2025
McKinney MO49 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6, Sec. 3(f) filed
Legislature
01/27/2025
Notice of hearing for February 03, 2025
Legislature
01/24/2025
Referred to Business and Labor Committee
Legislature
01/22/2025
Date of introduction