Legislature
|
04/25/2025
|
Presented to Governor on April 25, 2025
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/25/2025
|
President/Speaker signed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/25/2025
|
Passed on Final Reading 34-10-5
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/25/2025
|
Dispensing of reading at large approved
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/25/2025
|
Conrad FA136 not considered
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/25/2025
|
Motion to return to Select File failed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/25/2025
|
Conrad FA136 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/22/2025
|
Enrollment and Review ST20 recorded
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/22/2025
|
Enrollment and Review ST20 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/22/2025
|
Placed on Final Reading with ST20
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/17/2025
|
Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/27/2025
|
Enrollment and Review ER31 recorded
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/27/2025
|
Enrollment and Review ER31 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/27/2025
|
Placed on Select File with ER31
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/19/2025
|
Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/19/2025
|
General Affairs AM549 adopted
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/19/2025
|
Raybould AM646 lost
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/19/2025
|
Raybould AM646 to AM549 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/12/2025
|
General Affairs priority bill
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/10/2025
|
General Affairs AM549 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/10/2025
|
Placed on General File with AM549
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/05/2025
|
Notice of hearing for February 24, 2025
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/17/2025
|
Rereferred to General Affairs Committee
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/13/2025
|
Referred to Revenue Committee
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/09/2025
|
Date of introduction
|
|
|