Legislature | 03/25/2025 | Kauth MO128 Recommit to the Revenue Committee filed | ||
Legislature | 03/25/2025 | Kauth MO127 Bracket until June 9, 2025 filed | ||
Legislature | 03/25/2025 | Kauth MO126 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6, Sec. 3(f) filed | ||
Legislature | 03/14/2025 | Andersen name added | ||
Legislature | 03/14/2025 | Andersen priority resolution | ||
Legislature | 02/20/2025 | Notice of hearing for February 28, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 01/16/2025 | Referred to Revenue Committee | ||
Legislature | 01/14/2025 | Date of introduction |