LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Nebraska NE
Legislatures
2025-2026 Regular Session
Legislature
Bills
LR40
Action History
NE
Nebraska Legislature Bill LR40
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Nebraska 2025-2026 Regular Session
Nebraska Legislature Bill LR40
Action History
Legislature
04/15/2025
Reported to the Legislature for further consideration
Legislature
02/28/2025
Notice of hearing for March 18, 2025
Legislature
02/11/2025
Referred to Executive Board
Legislature
02/05/2025
Referred to Reference Committee
Legislature
02/05/2025
Laid over
Legislature
02/05/2025
Date of introduction