LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New Jersey NJ
Legislatures
2022-2023 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
A1569
Action History
NJ
New Jersey Assembly Bill A1569
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
New Jersey 2022-2023 Regular Session
New Jersey Assembly Bill A1569
Action History
Senate
11/27/2023
Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Assembly
06/30/2023
Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0)
Assembly
06/15/2023
Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Assembly
05/08/2023
Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Assembly
01/11/2022
Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee