LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New Jersey NJ
Legislatures
2022-2023 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
A2886
Action History
NJ
New Jersey Assembly Bill A2886
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
New Jersey 2022-2023 Regular Session
New Jersey Assembly Bill A2886
Action History
Senate
12/01/2022
Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Assembly
11/21/2022
Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0)
Assembly
10/27/2022
Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Wimberly)
Assembly
03/24/2022
Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Speight)
Assembly
03/14/2022
Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Assembly
02/28/2022
Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee