New Jersey 2022-2023 Regular Session

New Jersey Assembly Bill A3905 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 ASSEMBLY, No. 3905 STATE OF NEW JERSEY 220th LEGISLATURE INTRODUCED MAY 9, 2022
22
33 ASSEMBLY, No. 3905
44
55
66
77 STATE OF NEW JERSEY
88
99 220th LEGISLATURE
1010
1111
1212
1313 INTRODUCED MAY 9, 2022
1414
1515
1616
1717 Sponsored by: Assemblyman HERB CONAWAY, JR. District 7 (Burlington) SYNOPSIS Expands eligibility for veterans' civil service preference; creates additional preference benefits. CURRENT VERSION OF TEXT As introduced.
1818
1919
2020
2121 Sponsored by:
2222
2323 Assemblyman HERB CONAWAY, JR.
2424
2525 District 7 (Burlington)
2626
2727
2828
2929
3030
3131
3232
3333
3434
3535 SYNOPSIS
3636
3737 Expands eligibility for veterans' civil service preference; creates additional preference benefits.
3838
3939
4040
4141 CURRENT VERSION OF TEXT
4242
4343 As introduced.
4444
4545
4646
4747 An Act concerning veterans' civil service preference and supplementing chapter 5 of Title 11A of the New Jersey Statutes. Be It Enacted by the Senate and General Assembly of the State of New Jersey: 1. a. Any individual who does not meet the definition of disabled veteran pursuant to subsection a. of N.J.S.11A:5-1, but does meet the definition of disabled veteran in federal law by 5 U.S.C. s.2108 as may be amended and supplemented and receives a passing score on an open competitive examination shall be entitled to ten additional points above the individual's earned score. b. Any individual who does not meet the definition of veteran pursuant to subsection b. of N.J.S.11A:5-1 but does meet the definition of veteran in federal law by 5 U.S.C. s.2108 as may be amended and supplemented and receives a passing score on an open competitive examination shall be entitled to five additional points above the individual's earned score. 2. This act shall take effect on July 1 next following enactment, and shall apply to persons taking examinations for appointments after that date. STATEMENT This bill would expand eligibility for veterans' hiring preference in the civil service so that individuals who are eligible for veterans' preference in the federal civil service, but are not eligible for preference in the State civil service, would receive additional points above the individual's earned score on State civil service examinations. To receive the additional points, an individual must meet the eligibility requirements in section 2108 of Title 5, United States Code, as may be amended and supplemented. This means that an honorable or general discharge is necessary. National Guard and Reserve active duty for training purposes would not qualify. Under the bill, five points would be added to the passing examination score of an individual who is not eligible for State veterans' hiring preference, but served: -During the period December 7, 1941, to July 1, 1955; or -For more than 180 consecutive days, any part of which occurred after January 31, 1955, and before October 15, 1976; or -During the Gulf War from August 2, 1990 through January 2, 1992; or -In a campaign or expedition for which a campaign medal has been authorized, including El Salvador, Grenada, Haiti, Lebanon, Panama, Somalia, Southwest Asia, Bosnia, and the Global War on Terrorism. Ten points would be added to the passing examination score of an individual who is not eligible for State disabled veterans' hiring preference, but who served at any time and (1) has a present service-connected disability or (2) is receiving compensation, disability retirement benefits, or a pension from the federal military or the Department of Veterans Affairs. The application of this new benefit to disabled veterans who did not serve in a time of war would apply only if an amendment to the State constitution is approved by the voters to permit such disabled veterans to receive the benefit.
4848
4949 An Act concerning veterans' civil service preference and supplementing chapter 5 of Title 11A of the New Jersey Statutes.
5050
5151
5252
5353 Be It Enacted by the Senate and General Assembly of the State of New Jersey:
5454
5555
5656
5757 1. a. Any individual who does not meet the definition of disabled veteran pursuant to subsection a. of N.J.S.11A:5-1, but does meet the definition of disabled veteran in federal law by 5 U.S.C. s.2108 as may be amended and supplemented and receives a passing score on an open competitive examination shall be entitled to ten additional points above the individual's earned score.
5858
5959 b. Any individual who does not meet the definition of veteran pursuant to subsection b. of N.J.S.11A:5-1 but does meet the definition of veteran in federal law by 5 U.S.C. s.2108 as may be amended and supplemented and receives a passing score on an open competitive examination shall be entitled to five additional points above the individual's earned score.
6060
6161
6262
6363 2. This act shall take effect on July 1 next following enactment, and shall apply to persons taking examinations for appointments after that date.
6464
6565
6666
6767
6868
6969 STATEMENT
7070
7171
7272
7373 This bill would expand eligibility for veterans' hiring preference in the civil service so that individuals who are eligible for veterans' preference in the federal civil service, but are not eligible for preference in the State civil service, would receive additional points above the individual's earned score on State civil service examinations.
7474
7575 To receive the additional points, an individual must meet the eligibility requirements in section 2108 of Title 5, United States Code, as may be amended and supplemented. This means that an honorable or general discharge is necessary. National Guard and Reserve active duty for training purposes would not qualify.
7676
7777 Under the bill, five points would be added to the passing examination score of an individual who is not eligible for State veterans' hiring preference, but served:
7878
7979 -During the period December 7, 1941, to July 1, 1955; or
8080
8181 -For more than 180 consecutive days, any part of which occurred after January 31, 1955, and before October 15, 1976; or
8282
8383 -During the Gulf War from August 2, 1990 through January 2, 1992; or
8484
8585 -In a campaign or expedition for which a campaign medal has been authorized, including El Salvador, Grenada, Haiti, Lebanon, Panama, Somalia, Southwest Asia, Bosnia, and the Global War on Terrorism.
8686
8787 Ten points would be added to the passing examination score of an individual who is not eligible for State disabled veterans' hiring preference, but who served at any time and (1) has a present service-connected disability or (2) is receiving compensation, disability retirement benefits, or a pension from the federal military or the Department of Veterans Affairs.
8888
8989 The application of this new benefit to disabled veterans who did not serve in a time of war would apply only if an amendment to the State constitution is approved by the voters to permit such disabled veterans to receive the benefit.