LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New Jersey NJ
Legislatures
2022-2023 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR81
Action History
NJ
New Jersey Assembly Bill ACR81
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
New Jersey 2022-2023 Regular Session
New Jersey Assembly Bill ACR81
Action History
Senate
02/23/2023
Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Senate
05/12/2022
Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Assembly
03/24/2022
Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
Assembly
03/10/2022
Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Assembly
02/07/2022
Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee