LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New Jersey NJ
Legislatures
2022-2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S3887
Action History
NJ
New Jersey Senate Bill S3887
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
New Jersey 2022-2023 Regular Session
New Jersey Senate Bill S3887
Action History
Assembly
06/30/2023
Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Senate
06/30/2023
Passed by the Senate (37-0)
Senate
06/26/2023
Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz)
Senate
06/20/2023
Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Senate
06/15/2023
Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Senate
05/22/2023
Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee