LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New Jersey NJ
Legislatures
2022-2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S737
Action History
NJ
New Jersey Senate Bill S737
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
New Jersey 2022-2023 Regular Session
New Jersey Senate Bill S737
Action History
Assembly
02/13/2023
Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Assembly
03/07/2022
Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Senate
03/03/2022
Passed by the Senate (38-0)
Senate
02/28/2022
Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
Senate
01/11/2022
Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee