Senate | 05/08/2025 | Approved P.L.2025, c.51. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Substituted for A2813 | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | ||
Senate | 10/21/2024 | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 04/11/2024 | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2024 | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2024 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | ||
Assembly | 01/09/2024 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |