Senate | 03/06/2025 | Approved P.L.2025, JR-2. | ||
Senate | 01/14/2025 | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0) | ||
Senate | 01/14/2025 | Substituted for SJR110 | ||
Senate | 12/19/2024 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | ||
Senate | 04/11/2024 | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2024 | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2024 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | ||
Assembly | 02/05/2024 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |