Assembly | 04/11/2025 | Approved P.L.2025, JR-6. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2025 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (63-0-5) | ||
Assembly | 01/14/2025 | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence | ||
Senate | 01/14/2025 | Passed by the Senate (33-0) | ||
Senate | 01/14/2025 | Substituted for SJR104 (2R) | ||
Senate | 12/19/2024 | Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz) | ||
Senate | 12/05/2024 | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading | ||
Assembly | 10/28/2024 | Passed by the Assembly (63-0-9) | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2024 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |