Assembly | 09/12/2024 | Approved P.L.2024, c.66. | ||
Assembly | 06/28/2024 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (64-7-2) | ||
Assembly | 06/28/2024 | Substituted for A1970 (ACS) | ||
Assembly | 06/28/2024 | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading | ||
Senate | 06/28/2024 | Passed by the Senate (27-12) | ||
Senate | 06/24/2024 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | ||
Senate | 05/09/2024 | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 05/09/2024 | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |