New Jersey 2024-2025 Regular Session

New Jersey Senate Bill S2366 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 SENATE, No. 2366 STATE OF NEW JERSEY 221st LEGISLATURE INTRODUCED JANUARY 29, 2024
22
33 SENATE, No. 2366
44
55 STATE OF NEW JERSEY
66
77 221st LEGISLATURE
88
99
1010
1111 INTRODUCED JANUARY 29, 2024
1212
1313
1414
1515 Sponsored by: Senator JAMES BEACH District 6 (Burlington and Camden) SYNOPSIS Expands eligibility for veterans' civil service preference; creates additional preference benefits. CURRENT VERSION OF TEXT As introduced.
1616
1717
1818
1919 Sponsored by:
2020
2121 Senator JAMES BEACH
2222
2323 District 6 (Burlington and Camden)
2424
2525
2626
2727
2828
2929
3030
3131
3232
3333 SYNOPSIS
3434
3535 Expands eligibility for veterans' civil service preference; creates additional preference benefits.
3636
3737
3838
3939 CURRENT VERSION OF TEXT
4040
4141 As introduced.
4242
4343
4444
4545 An Act concerning veterans' civil service preference and supplementing chapter 5 of Title 11A of the New Jersey Statutes. Be It Enacted by the Senate and General Assembly of the State of New Jersey: 1. a. Any individual who does not meet the definition of disabled veteran pursuant to subsection a. of N.J.S.11A:5-1, but does meet the definition of disabled veteran in federal law by 5 U.S.C. s.2108 as may be amended and supplemented and receives a passing score on an open competitive examination shall be entitled to ten additional points above the individual's earned score. b. Any individual who does not meet the definition of veteran pursuant to subsection b. of N.J.S.11A:5-1 but does meet the definition of veteran in federal law by 5 U.S.C. s.2108 as may be amended and supplemented and receives a passing score on an open competitive examination shall be entitled to five additional points above the individual's earned score. 2. This act shall take effect on July 1 next following enactment, and shall apply to persons taking examinations for appointments after that date. STATEMENT This bill would expand eligibility for veterans' hiring preference in the civil service so that individuals who are eligible for veterans' preference in the federal civil service, but are not eligible for preference in the State civil service, would receive additional points above the individual's earned score on State civil service examinations. To receive the additional points, an individual must meet the eligibility requirements established under section 2108 of Title 5, United States Code, as may be amended and supplemented. This means that an honorable or general discharge is necessary. National Guard and Reserve active duty for training purposes would not qualify. Under the bill, five points would be added to the passing examination score of an individual who is not eligible for State veterans' hiring preference, but served: during the period December 7, 1941, to July 1, 1955; or for more than 180 consecutive days, any part of which occurred after January 31, 1955, and before October 15, 1976; or during the Gulf War from August 2, 1990 through January 2, 1992; or in a campaign or expedition for which a campaign medal has been authorized, including El Salvador, Grenada, Haiti, Lebanon, Panama, Somalia, Southwest Asia, Bosnia, and the Global War on Terrorism. Under the bill, ten points would be added to the passing examination score of an individual who is not eligible for State disabled veterans' hiring preference, but who served at any time and (1) has a present service-connected disability or (2) is receiving compensation, disability retirement benefits, or a pension from the federal military or the Department of Veterans Affairs. This new benefit to disabled veterans who did not serve in a time of war would apply only if an amendment to the State Constitution is approved by the voters to permit such disabled veterans to receive the benefit.
4646
4747 An Act concerning veterans' civil service preference and supplementing chapter 5 of Title 11A of the New Jersey Statutes.
4848
4949
5050
5151 Be It Enacted by the Senate and General Assembly of the State of New Jersey:
5252
5353
5454
5555 1. a. Any individual who does not meet the definition of disabled veteran pursuant to subsection a. of N.J.S.11A:5-1, but does meet the definition of disabled veteran in federal law by 5 U.S.C. s.2108 as may be amended and supplemented and receives a passing score on an open competitive examination shall be entitled to ten additional points above the individual's earned score.
5656
5757 b. Any individual who does not meet the definition of veteran pursuant to subsection b. of N.J.S.11A:5-1 but does meet the definition of veteran in federal law by 5 U.S.C. s.2108 as may be amended and supplemented and receives a passing score on an open competitive examination shall be entitled to five additional points above the individual's earned score.
5858
5959
6060
6161 2. This act shall take effect on July 1 next following enactment, and shall apply to persons taking examinations for appointments after that date.
6262
6363
6464
6565
6666
6767 STATEMENT
6868
6969
7070
7171 This bill would expand eligibility for veterans' hiring preference in the civil service so that individuals who are eligible for veterans' preference in the federal civil service, but are not eligible for preference in the State civil service, would receive additional points above the individual's earned score on State civil service examinations.
7272
7373 To receive the additional points, an individual must meet the eligibility requirements established under section 2108 of Title 5, United States Code, as may be amended and supplemented. This means that an honorable or general discharge is necessary. National Guard and Reserve active duty for training purposes would not qualify.
7474
7575 Under the bill, five points would be added to the passing examination score of an individual who is not eligible for State veterans' hiring preference, but served:
7676
7777 during the period December 7, 1941, to July 1, 1955; or
7878
7979 for more than 180 consecutive days, any part of which occurred after January 31, 1955, and before October 15, 1976; or
8080
8181 during the Gulf War from August 2, 1990 through January 2, 1992; or
8282
8383 in a campaign or expedition for which a campaign medal has been authorized, including El Salvador, Grenada, Haiti, Lebanon, Panama, Somalia, Southwest Asia, Bosnia, and the Global War on Terrorism.
8484
8585 Under the bill, ten points would be added to the passing examination score of an individual who is not eligible for State disabled veterans' hiring preference, but who served at any time and (1) has a present service-connected disability or (2) is receiving compensation, disability retirement benefits, or a pension from the federal military or the Department of Veterans Affairs.
8686
8787 This new benefit to disabled veterans who did not serve in a time of war would apply only if an amendment to the State Constitution is approved by the voters to permit such disabled veterans to receive the benefit.