Senate | 04/22/2025 | Approved P.L.2025, c.47. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (25-13) | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2025 | Passed by the Assembly (60-16-0) | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2025 | Substituted for A4817 (2R) | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2025 | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Quijano) | ||
Assembly | 12/09/2024 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | ||
Assembly | 10/28/2024 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee | ||
Senate | 10/28/2024 | Passed by the Senate (27-13) | ||
Senate | 10/10/2024 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | ||
Senate | 09/19/2024 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |