Assembly | 03/12/2025 | Approved P.L.2025, c.34. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2025 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0) | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2025 | Substituted for A5007 (1R) | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2025 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2025 | Reported and Referred to Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee | ||
Assembly | 12/19/2024 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee | ||
Senate | 12/19/2024 | Passed by the Senate (38-0) | ||
Senate | 12/09/2024 | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading | ||
Senate | 10/28/2024 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |