Assembly | 03/20/2025 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2025 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Passed by the Senate (38-0) | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | ||
Senate | 01/30/2025 | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 12/16/2024 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | ||
Senate | 12/09/2024 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |