Assembly | 03/31/2025 | Approved P.L.2025, JR-4. | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2025 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0) | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2025 | Substituted for AJR202 | ||
Assembly | 03/06/2025 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2025 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health Committee | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Passed by the Senate (38-0) | ||
Senate | 12/09/2024 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | ||
Senate | 10/10/2024 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |