House | 04/07/2023 | Signed by Governor - Chapter 210 - Apr. 7 | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | House has concurred with Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/12/2023 | Passed in the Senate - Y:25 N:16 | ||
Senate | 03/12/2023 | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:52 N:17 | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Sent to HAFC - Referrals: HAFC |