House | 03/30/2023 | Signed by Governor - Chapter 66 - Mar. 30 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Passed in the Senate - Y:39 N:0 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Sent to SHPAC - Referrals: SHPAC | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:67 N:0 | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC/HHHC |