LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New Mexico NM
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB213
Action History
NM
New Mexico House Bill HB213
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
New Mexico 2023 Regular Session
New Mexico House Bill HB213
Action History
Senate
03/03/2023
Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC
House
03/02/2023
Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:67 N:0
House
03/02/2023
House of Representatives Floor Amendment
House
02/25/2023
HJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution
House
02/09/2023
HTPWC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
House
01/27/2023
Sent to HTPWC - Referrals: HTPWC/HJC