House | 03/16/2023 | Vetoed by Governor | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Passed in the Senate - Y:39 N:0 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | SRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SEC | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:63 N:0 | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | House of Representatives Floor Amendment | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation | ||
House | 01/27/2023 | Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC |