House | 03/20/2025 | Vetoed by Governor | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Passed in the Senate - Y:39 N:0 | ||
Senate | 03/16/2025 | STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Sent to STBTC - Referrals: STBTC | ||
House | 03/08/2025 | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:59 N:0 | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation | ||
House | 02/28/2025 | HLVMC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | Sent to HLVMC - Referrals: HLVMC/HTRC |