Senate | 04/10/2025 | Signed by Governor - Chapter 143 - Apr. 10 | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:40 N:23 | ||
House | 03/15/2025 | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | HGEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation | ||
House | 02/21/2025 | Sent to HGEIC - Referrals: HGEIC/HJC | ||
Senate | 02/12/2025 | Passed in the Senate - Y:39 N:0 | ||
Senate | 02/06/2025 | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation | ||
Senate | 01/31/2025 | SRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 01/23/2025 | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SJC |