Senate | 03/21/2025 | Signed by Governor - Chapter 14 - Mar. 21 | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:66 N:0 | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation and placed on temporary calendar | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | Sent to HCEDC - Referrals: HCEDC | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | Passed in the Senate - Y:40 N:0 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2025 | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation | ||
Senate | 02/14/2025 | STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution | ||
Senate | 01/28/2025 | Sent to STBTC - Referrals: STBTC/SFC |