Senate | 03/22/2025 | Vetoed by Governor | ||
House | 03/22/2025 | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:63 N:0 | ||
House | 03/21/2025 | HGEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Sent to HGEIC - Referrals: HGEIC | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Passed in the Senate - Y:28 N:0 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation | ||
Senate | 02/17/2025 | SIRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Sent to SIRC - Referrals: SIRC/SHPAC |