LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New Mexico NM
Legislatures
2025 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SJR15
Action History
NM
New Mexico Senate Bill SJR15
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
New Mexico 2025 Regular Session
New Mexico Senate Bill SJR15
Action History
House
03/12/2025
Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC/HJC
Senate
03/10/2025
Passed in the Senate - Y:27 N:15
Senate
03/10/2025
Senate Floor Amendment
Senate
03/05/2025
SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Senate
03/03/2025
SRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Senate
02/26/2025
Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SEC