Assembly | 06/16/2023 | Vetoed by the Governor. | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 16, Nays: 5.) To Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/04/2023 | Read second time. | ||
Senate | 06/04/2023 | From committee: Do pass. | ||
Senate | 06/04/2023 | Placed on Second Reading File. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2023 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2023 | In Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 14.) To Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 840.) To printer. | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2023 | Notice of exemption. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2023 | From printer. To committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2023 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |