Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Chapter 385.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint. To enrollment.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
To printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Conference report adopted by Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 648 and further amend. (Conference Amend. No. CA3.) Conference report adopted by Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2023
|
Assembly Amendment No. 648 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
In Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2023
|
In Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Assembly Amendment No. 648 not concurred in. To Assembly.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2023
|
Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2023
|
From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2023
|
Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 648.) To printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on Second Reading File.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2023
|
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 352.) To printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
From printer. To committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.
|
|
|