Senate | 06/01/2023 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 158. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2023 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2023 | In Senate. To enrollment. | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | To Senate. | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 2.) | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2023 | Read second time. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | From committee: Do pass. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2023 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2023 | In Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Placed on Second Reading File. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | From printer. To committee. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |