Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
No further consideration.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Made Special Order of Business for Monday, June 5, 2023, at 11:15 A.M.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Vetoed by the Governor. Returned to Senate with Governor's veto message.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 14.) To Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2023
|
Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2023
|
Read second time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2023
|
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2023
|
In Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 527.) To printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on Second Reading File.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Placed on Second Reading File.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
From printer. To committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.
|
|
|