Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 35.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Assembly Amendment No. 582 concurred in. To enrollment.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
In Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2023
|
To Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2023
|
From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 582.) Dispensed with reprinting.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2023
|
Read second time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2023
|
From committee: Do pass.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2023
|
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2023
|
In Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 518.) To printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Placed on Second Reading File.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
From printer. To committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.
|
|
|