Senate
|
06/12/2023
|
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 329. (Effective June 8, 2023)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2023
|
Read second time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2023
|
Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2023
|
Taken from Second Reading File.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2023
|
From committee: Do pass.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2023
|
Placed on Second Reading File.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2023
|
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2023
|
In Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
To printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Reprinting dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 830.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Placed on General File.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Re-referred to Committee on Finance. Exemption effective. To printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 429.) Taken from General File.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Notice of eligibility for exemption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
From printer. To committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.
|
|
|